Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Postconviction Review – Convictions Resulting From Pleas
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Stating the intent of the General Assembly that a criminal defendant who seeks postconviction review under a certain provision of law may not be precluded from seeking relief because a certain conviction was the result of a guilty plea, an Alford plea, or a plea of nolo contendere.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Postconviction Review – Convictions Resulting From Pleas
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Postconviction Review – Convictions Resulting From Pleas
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:37 PM
Click to return on the top page