Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Coastal Area - Protection From Offshore Oil and Gas Drilling
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias, Miller, Astle, Bates, Benson, Brochin, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Hershey, Jennings, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Oaks, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Reilly, Robinson, Rosapepe, Salling, Simonaire, Smith, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 11:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expressing the strong and unequivocal opposition of the General Assembly of Maryland to the draft proposed National Outer Continental Shelf Oil and Gas Leasing Program for 2019-2024, and the implementation of any offshore oil or gas leasing, exploration, development, or production in the Atlantic Ocean; urging the Secretary of the Interior of the United States to remove Maryland from the proposed leasing program; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Coastal Area - Protection From Offshore Oil and Gas Drilling
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Coastal Area - Protection From Offshore Oil and Gas Drilling
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Coastal Area - Protection From Offshore Oil and Gas Drilling
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Coastal Area - Protection From Offshore Oil and Gas Drilling
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Hearing 3/30 at 11:30 a.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:37 PM
Click to return on the top page