Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Attorney General, Office Of The

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0729 (SB0530)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Filing Surcharge and Prohibited Lease Provisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0739 (SB0524)
Title
Environment - Multidefendant Oil and Hazardous Substance Pollution Cases - Effect of Settlement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0848 (SB0657)
Title
Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to Appear
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0524 (HB0739)
Title
Environment - Multidefendant Oil and Hazardous Substance Pollution Cases - Effect of Settlement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0530 (HB0729)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Filing Surcharge and Prohibited Lease Provisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0657 (HB0848)
Title
Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to Appear
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0729 (SB0530) Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Filing Surcharge and Prohibited Lease Provisions By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0739 (SB0524) Environment - Multidefendant Oil and Hazardous Substance Pollution Cases - Effect of Settlement By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0848 (SB0657) Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to Appear By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0524 (HB0739) Environment - Multidefendant Oil and Hazardous Substance Pollution Cases - Effect of Settlement By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0530 (HB0729) Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Filing Surcharge and Prohibited Lease Provisions By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0657 (HB0848) Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to Appear By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 12:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2021 - 12:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2021 11:00 AM
Click to return on the top page