Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Attorney General, Office Of The

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0298 (SB0223)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Filing Surcharge and Prohibited Lease Provisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0299 (SB0224)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards and Conditions - Definition of Employer
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0402 (SB0221)
Title
Department of the Environment - Enforcement Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0425 /CH0018 (SB0387/CH0019)
Title
Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0221 (HB0402)
Title
Department of the Environment – Enforcement Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0223 (HB0298)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Filing Surcharge and Prohibited Lease Provisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0224 (HB0299)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards and Conditions - Definition of Employer
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0387 /CH0019 (HB0425/CH0018)
Title
Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0298 (SB0223) Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Filing Surcharge and Prohibited Lease Provisions By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0299 (SB0224) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards and Conditions - Definition of Employer By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0402 (SB0221) Department of the Environment - Enforcement Authority By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0425 /CH0018 (SB0387/CH0019) Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18
Judiciary
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0221 (HB0402) Department of the Environment – Enforcement Authority By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0223 (HB0298) Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Filing Surcharge and Prohibited Lease Provisions By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0224 (HB0299) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards and Conditions - Definition of Employer By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0387 /CH0019 (HB0425/CH0018) Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:36 PM
Click to return on the top page