Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Baltimore City Administration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0149
Title
Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0194 (SB0270)
Title
Baltimore City - School Facilities - Funding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0197 (SB0271)
Title
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0521 (SB0366/CH0462)
Title
Baltimore City - Extinguishment or Redemption of Ground Rents
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0525 (SB0516/CH0283)
Title
Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0588 (SB0473/CH0474)
Title
Baltimore City - Children - Records Access
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0770 (SB0742/CH0312)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Residential Parking in Baltimore City
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0966 (SB0788)
Title
Task Force to Study Citations for Children and Law Enforcement Diversion Practices
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1053 /CH0041 (SB0282/CH0040)
Title
Video Lottery Facilities - Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude or Gambling
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0270 (HB0194)
Title
Baltimore City - School Facilities - Funding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0271 (HB0197)
Title
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0282 /CH0040 (HB1053/CH0041)
Title
Video Lottery Facilities - Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude or Gambling
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0366 /CH0462 (HB0521)
Title
Baltimore City - Extinguishment or Redemption of Ground Rents
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0473 /CH0474 (HB0588)
Title
Baltimore City - Children - Records Access
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0516 /CH0283 (HB0525)
Title
Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0742 /CH0312 (HB0770)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Residential Parking in Baltimore City
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0149 Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Program By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB0194 (SB0270) Baltimore City - School Facilities - Funding By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0197 (SB0271) Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0521 (SB0366/CH0462) Baltimore City - Extinguishment or Redemption of Ground Rents By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0525 (SB0516/CH0283) Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0588 (SB0473/CH0474) Baltimore City - Children - Records Access By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0770 (SB0742/CH0312) Vehicle Laws - Residential Parking in Baltimore City By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0966 (SB0788) Task Force to Study Citations for Children and Law Enforcement Diversion Practices By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1053 /CH0041 (SB0282/CH0040) Video Lottery Facilities - Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude or Gambling By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Ways and Means
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0270 (HB0194) Baltimore City - School Facilities - Funding By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Budget and Taxation
SB0271 (HB0197) Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Penalties By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0282 /CH0040 (HB1053/CH0041) Video Lottery Facilities - Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude or Gambling By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0366 /CH0462 (HB0521) Baltimore City - Extinguishment or Redemption of Ground Rents By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 462
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0473 /CH0474 (HB0588) Baltimore City - Children - Records Access By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0516 /CH0283 (HB0525) Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0742 /CH0312 (HB0770) Vehicle Laws - Residential Parking in Baltimore City By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM
Click to return on the top page