Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Baltimore City Administration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0941
Title
Motor Vehicles - Speed Limits - Establishment and Enforcement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0967 /CH0628
Title
Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems - Interstate 83
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1027 (SB0786/CH0133)
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Baltimore City - Control of the Police Department of Baltimore City
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0786 /CH0133 (HB1027)
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Baltimore City - Control of the Police Department of Baltimore City
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789 /CH0209 (HB1301/CH0208)
Title
Baltimore City - Visit Baltimore - Appropriation Calculation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0941 Motor Vehicles - Speed Limits - Establishment and Enforcement By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0967 /CH0628 Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems - Interstate 83 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 628
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1027 (SB0786/CH0133) Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Baltimore City - Control of the Police Department of Baltimore City By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
SB0786 /CH0133 (HB1027) Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Baltimore City - Control of the Police Department of Baltimore City By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 133
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0789 /CH0209 (HB1301/CH0208) Baltimore City - Visit Baltimore - Appropriation Calculation By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:17 PM
Click to return on the top page