Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Baltimore City Administration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0901 (SB0499)
Title
Baltimore City - Highway User Revenues Capital Grants - Calculation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0913 (SB0500)
Title
Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems - Interstate 83
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1016 (SB0672)
Title
Baltimore Convention and Tourism Redevelopment and Operating Authority Task Force - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1501 (SB0825)
Title
Baltimore City - Assault of Special Enforcement Officers - Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1502
Title
Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Pilot Program - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1508 (SB1037)
Title
Baltimore City - Sales Tax - Authorization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1533
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration Records - Access to Digital Photographic Images and Signatures - Baltimore City
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0370 (HB0556)
Title
Drug Paraphernalia for Administration - Decriminalization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0402
Title
Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems - Maximum Penalty Increase
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0499 (HB0901)
Title
Baltimore City - Highway User Revenues Capital Grants - Calculation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0500 (HB0913)
Title
Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems - Interstate 83
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0501
Title
Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring System Citations - Late Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0573 (HB1009)
Title
Baltimore City - Ordinance Enforcement - Amount of Fines and Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0672 (HB1016)
Title
Baltimore Convention and Tourism Redevelopment and Operating Authority Task Force - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0761
Title
Motor Vehicles - Installment Payment Plans - Automated Enforcement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0825 (HB1501)
Title
Baltimore City - Assault of Special Enforcement Officers - Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0901 (SB0499) Baltimore City - Highway User Revenues Capital Grants - Calculation By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0913 (SB0500) Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems - Interstate 83 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1016 (SB0672) Baltimore Convention and Tourism Redevelopment and Operating Authority Task Force - Revisions By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1501 (SB0825) Baltimore City - Assault of Special Enforcement Officers - Penalties By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1502 Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Pilot Program - Revisions By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2025 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1508 (SB1037) Baltimore City - Sales Tax - Authorization By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1533 Motor Vehicle Administration Records - Access to Digital Photographic Images and Signatures - Baltimore City By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0370 (HB0556) Drug Paraphernalia for Administration - Decriminalization By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2025 - 11:00 AM
SB0402 Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems - Maximum Penalty Increase By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0499 (HB0901) Baltimore City - Highway User Revenues Capital Grants - Calculation By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0500 (HB0913) Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems - Interstate 83 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0501 Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring System Citations - Late Fees By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0573 (HB1009) Baltimore City - Ordinance Enforcement - Amount of Fines and Penalties By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0672 (HB1016) Baltimore Convention and Tourism Redevelopment and Operating Authority Task Force - Revisions By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0761 Motor Vehicles - Installment Payment Plans - Automated Enforcement By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0825 (HB1501) Baltimore City - Assault of Special Enforcement Officers - Penalties By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/7/2025 11:39 PM
Click to return on the top page