Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Calvert County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1160
Title
Calvert County – Long–Term Contracts for Cellular Tower Leases
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1173
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1174
Title
State Boat Act – Removal of Vessels From Marinas – Calvert County Board of County Commissioners Facilities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1160 Calvert County – Long–Term Contracts for Cellular Tower Leases By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1173 Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1174 State Boat Act – Removal of Vessels From Marinas – Calvert County Board of County Commissioners Facilities By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 6:42 PM
Click to return on the top page