Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Carroll County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0437 /CH0686 (HB0839/CH0685)
Title
Carroll County - Contracts and Purchasing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0693 (HB0796/CH0684)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0963 (HB1080)
Title
Carroll County - Office of Permits and Inspections - Denial of Commercial Permit or License for Unpaid Assessed Personal Property Taxes
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0965 (HB1060)
Title
Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1108 /CH0311 (HB0720/CH0310)
Title
Carroll County - Deputy Clerk or Deputy Sheriff - Oath of Office
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0437 /CH0686 (HB0839/CH0685) Carroll County - Contracts and Purchasing By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 686
Budget and Taxation
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0693 (HB0796/CH0684) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0963 (HB1080) Carroll County - Office of Permits and Inspections - Denial of Commercial Permit or License for Unpaid Assessed Personal Property Taxes By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Budget and Taxation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0965 (HB1060) Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB1108 /CH0311 (HB0720/CH0310) Carroll County - Deputy Clerk or Deputy Sheriff - Oath of Office By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/15/2024 2:41 PM
Click to return on the top page