Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Aging, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0132 /CH0208
Title
Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program - Regulations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0146 /CH0110
Title
Secretary of Aging - Administration of Commodity Supplemental Food Program and Regulatory Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0147 /CH0206
Title
Healthy Aging Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0199 /CH0116
Title
Capital Grants for Senior Citizen Activities Centers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0047 /CH0207
Title
Reporting Abuse to the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program and the Office of Health Care Quality
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0132 /CH0208 Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program - Regulations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0146 /CH0110 Secretary of Aging - Administration of Commodity Supplemental Food Program and Regulatory Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0147 /CH0206 Healthy Aging Program By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0199 /CH0116 Capital Grants for Senior Citizen Activities Centers By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0047 /CH0207 Reporting Abuse to the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program and the Office of Health Care Quality By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Finance
1/19/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM
Click to return on the top page