Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Alcohol, Tobacco, And Cannabis Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0012 /CH0057 (SB0214/CH0058)
Title
Cannabis - Sale and Distribution - Tetrahydrocannabinol Offenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0112 (SB0220)
Title
Alcohol, Tobacco, and Cannabis Commission – Enforcement Activities – Memorandum of Understanding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0214 /CH0058 (HB0012/CH0057)
Title
Cannabis - Sale and Distribution - Tetrahydrocannabinol Offenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 (HB0112)
Title
Alcohol, Tobacco, and Cannabis Commission - Enforcement Activities - Memorandum of Understanding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0012 /CH0057 (SB0214/CH0058) Cannabis - Sale and Distribution - Tetrahydrocannabinol Offenses By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Economic Matters
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0112 (SB0220) Alcohol, Tobacco, and Cannabis Commission – Enforcement Activities – Memorandum of Understanding By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/29/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0214 /CH0058 (HB0012/CH0057) Cannabis - Sale and Distribution - Tetrahydrocannabinol Offenses By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Finance
1/30/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0220 (HB0112) Alcohol, Tobacco, and Cannabis Commission - Enforcement Activities - Memorandum of Understanding By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/16 at 3:00 p.m.
Finance
1/16/2025 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2025 3:45 PM
Click to return on the top page