Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Commerce, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0853 /CH0116
Title
Small, Minority, and Women–Owned Businesses Account – Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342 /CH0115
Title
Economic Development - Partnership for Workforce Quality Program - Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0019 /CH0112
Title
Economic Development - Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program - Alterations and Study
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0160 /CH0113
Title
Economic Development - Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program - Expansion, Extension, and Study
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0186 /CH0191
Title
Economic Development – Job Creation Tax Credit – Credit for Hiring Veterans
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196 /CH0114
Title
Economic Development – Research and Development Tax Credit – Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 /CH0250
Title
Arts and Entertainment Districts – Artistic Work and Arts and Entertainment Enterprise – Definitions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0339
Title
Department of Commerce - Sister-State Relationships - Maintenance and Development
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0853 /CH0116 Small, Minority, and Women–Owned Businesses Account – Alterations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1342 /CH0115 Economic Development - Partnership for Workforce Quality Program - Alterations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Ways and Means
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0019 /CH0112 Economic Development - Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program - Alterations and Study By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0160 /CH0113 Economic Development - Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program - Expansion, Extension, and Study By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0186 /CH0191 Economic Development – Job Creation Tax Credit – Credit for Hiring Veterans By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0196 /CH0114 Economic Development – Research and Development Tax Credit – Alterations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0256 /CH0250 Arts and Entertainment Districts – Artistic Work and Arts and Entertainment Enterprise – Definitions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Finance
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0339 Department of Commerce - Sister-State Relationships - Maintenance and Development By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:31 PM
Click to return on the top page