Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Crime Control And Prevention, Office Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1428
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0037 /CH0009
Title
Funds - Obsolete Provisions - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1428 Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 9:30 a.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2017 - 9:30 AM
SB0037 /CH0009 Funds - Obsolete Provisions - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM
Click to return on the top page