Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Education, State Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0461 /CH0232
Title
State Early Childhood Advisory Council
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0120 /CH0136
Title
Education - Children With Disabilities - Parent Surrogates
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0124 /CH0138
Title
Education Coordinating Committee and Lida Lee Tall Learning Resources Center - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0125
Title
State-Aided Educational Institutions - Qualification Criteria
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0128
Title
Education - Compensatory Education Grants - Federal Community Eligibility Provision
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0461 /CH0232 State Early Childhood Advisory Council By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0120 /CH0136 Education - Children With Disabilities - Parent Surrogates By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2014 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0124 /CH0138 Education Coordinating Committee and Lida Lee Tall Learning Resources Center - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2014 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0125 State-Aided Educational Institutions - Qualification Criteria By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2014 - 3:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0128 Education - Compensatory Education Grants - Federal Community Eligibility Provision By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM
Click to return on the top page