Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Elections, State Board Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0041 /CH0282 (SB0267/CH0283)
Title
Election Law - Petitions for the Formation of a New Political Party - Process
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0075 /CH0126 (SB0262/CH0125)
Title
Election Law – Special Elections
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0199 /CH0280 (SB0257/CH0279)
Title
Election Law - Notice to Permanent Absentee Voters
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0274 (SB0259/CH0281)
Title
Election Law - Local Boards of Elections - Election Plan Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0257 /CH0279 (HB0199/CH0280)
Title
Election Law - Notice to Permanent Absentee Voters
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0259 /CH0281 (HB0274)
Title
Election Law - Local Boards of Elections - Election Plan Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0262 /CH0125 (HB0075/CH0126)
Title
Election Law - Special Elections
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0267 /CH0283 (HB0041/CH0282)
Title
Election Law - Petitions for the Formation of a New Political Party - Process
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0041 /CH0282 (SB0267/CH0283) Election Law - Petitions for the Formation of a New Political Party - Process By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Ways and Means
1/21/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0075 /CH0126 (SB0262/CH0125) Election Law – Special Elections By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Ways and Means
1/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0199 /CH0280 (SB0257/CH0279) Election Law - Notice to Permanent Absentee Voters By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Ways and Means
1/21/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0274 (SB0259/CH0281) Election Law - Local Boards of Elections - Election Plan Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/21/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0257 /CH0279 (HB0199/CH0280) Election Law - Notice to Permanent Absentee Voters By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/05/2025 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0259 /CH0281 (HB0274) Election Law - Local Boards of Elections - Election Plan Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/05/2025 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0262 /CH0125 (HB0075/CH0126) Election Law - Special Elections By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/05/2025 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0267 /CH0283 (HB0041/CH0282) Election Law - Petitions for the Formation of a New Political Party - Process By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/05/2025 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/8/2025 3:37 PM
Click to return on the top page