Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Environment, Department Of The

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0025 /CH0441 (SB0265/CH0442)
Title
Environment – Reservoir Augmentation Permit – Establishment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0049 (SB0256)
Title
Environment - Building Energy Performance Standards - Alterations and Analysis
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0250 /CH0432
Title
Department of the Environment - Fees, Penalties, Funding, and Regulation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 (HB0049)
Title
Environment - Building Energy Performance Standards - Compliance and Reporting
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 /CH0442 (HB0025/CH0441)
Title
Environment - Reservoir Augmentation Permit - Establishment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0025 /CH0441 (SB0265/CH0442) Environment – Reservoir Augmentation Permit – Establishment By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2025 - 1:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0049 (SB0256) Environment - Building Energy Performance Standards - Alterations and Analysis By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0250 /CH0432 Department of the Environment - Fees, Penalties, Funding, and Regulation By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0256 (HB0049) Environment - Building Energy Performance Standards - Compliance and Reporting By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0265 /CH0442 (HB0025/CH0441) Environment - Reservoir Augmentation Permit - Establishment By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/28/2025 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/15/2025 2:48 PM
Click to return on the top page