Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

General Services, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0073 /CH0075 (SB0194/CH0076)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - State Leasing of Real Property
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0276 /CH0077 (SB0260/CH0078)
Title
State Government - Forms - Reporting Requirement - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0194 /CH0076 (HB0073/CH0075)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - State Leasing of Real Property
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0260 /CH0078 (HB0276/CH0077)
Title
State Government - Forms - Reporting Requirement - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0073 /CH0075 (SB0194/CH0076) State Finance and Procurement - State Leasing of Real Property By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2025 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0276 /CH0077 (SB0260/CH0078) State Government - Forms - Reporting Requirement - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Health and Government Operations
1/21/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0194 /CH0076 (HB0073/CH0075) State Finance and Procurement - State Leasing of Real Property By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2025 - 11:30 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0260 /CH0078 (HB0276/CH0077) State Government - Forms - Reporting Requirement - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/23/2025 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2025 3:49 PM
Click to return on the top page