Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Higher Education Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0553
Title
Higher Education - Program Proposals - Review and Objections
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054 /CH0172
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Scholarship Funds - Technical Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0055 /CH0009
Title
Private Career Schools - Solicitor Permits - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0056 /CH0010
Title
Unauthorized Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Transcripts, Diplomas, and Grade Reports - Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0063 /CH0014
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Institutional Renewal Fees and Religious Educational Institutions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0553 Higher Education - Program Proposals - Review and Objections By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0054 /CH0172 Maryland Higher Education Commission - Scholarship Funds - Technical Alterations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2013 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0055 /CH0009 Private Career Schools - Solicitor Permits - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2013 - 3:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0056 /CH0010 Unauthorized Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Transcripts, Diplomas, and Grade Reports - Penalties By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2013 - 3:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0063 /CH0014 Maryland Higher Education Commission - Institutional Renewal Fees and Religious Educational Institutions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2013 - 3:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM
Click to return on the top page