Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Housing And Community Development, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0059 /CH0231 (SB0192)
Title
Property Tax – Tax Sales – Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090 (SB0235)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Project Restore Program - Establishment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093 (SB0234)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Homeless Shelter Certification Program - Establishment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0127 /CH0232 (SB0238/CH0233)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Maryland Housing Rehabilitation Program - Local Rehabilitation Program Administration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0155 (SB0247)
Title
Housing and Community Development – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reductions – Issuance of Loans and Achievement of Targets
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 (SB0188)
Title
Community Health and Safety Works Grant Program and Fund - Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0716 /CH0234
Title
Housing and Community Development - Statewide Rental Assistance Voucher Program Eligibility - Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0188 (HB0172)
Title
Community Health and Safety Works Grant Program and Fund - Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0192 (HB0059/CH0231)
Title
Property Tax - Tax Sales - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234 (HB0093)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Homeless Shelter Certification Program - Establishment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0235 (HB0090)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Project Restore Program - Establishment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0238 /CH0233 (HB0127/CH0232)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Maryland Housing Rehabilitation Program - Local Rehabilitation Program Administration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0247 (HB0155)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reductions - Issuance of Loans and Achievement of Targets
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0059 /CH0231 (SB0192) Property Tax – Tax Sales – Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Ways and Means
1/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0090 (SB0235) Housing and Community Development - Project Restore Program - Establishment By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/23/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0093 (SB0234) Housing and Community Development - Homeless Shelter Certification Program - Establishment By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0127 /CH0232 (SB0238/CH0233) Department of Housing and Community Development - Maryland Housing Rehabilitation Program - Local Rehabilitation Program Administration By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2025 - 2:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0155 (SB0247) Housing and Community Development – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reductions – Issuance of Loans and Achievement of Targets By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2025 - 2:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0172 (SB0188) Community Health and Safety Works Grant Program and Fund - Alterations By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2025 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0716 /CH0234 Housing and Community Development - Statewide Rental Assistance Voucher Program Eligibility - Alterations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0188 (HB0172) Community Health and Safety Works Grant Program and Fund - Alterations By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 10:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2025 - 10:30 AM
SB0192 (HB0059/CH0231) Property Tax - Tax Sales - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/22 at 10:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2025 - 10:30 AM
SB0234 (HB0093) Housing and Community Development - Homeless Shelter Certification Program - Establishment By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/21/2025 - 1:30 PM
SB0235 (HB0090) Housing and Community Development - Project Restore Program - Establishment By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/21/2025 - 1:30 PM
SB0238 /CH0233 (HB0127/CH0232) Department of Housing and Community Development - Maryland Housing Rehabilitation Program - Local Rehabilitation Program Administration By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/21/2025 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0247 (HB0155) Housing and Community Development - Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reductions - Issuance of Loans and Achievement of Targets By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/21/2025 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/24/2025 10:43 AM
Click to return on the top page