Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Health, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0168 /CH0220
Title
Department of Health - ImmuNet and Statewide Advisory Commission on Immunizations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0174 /CH0221
Title
Mortality and Quality Review Committee - Duties, Reports, and Data - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0186 /CH0222
Title
Maryland AIDS Drug Assistance Program Fund
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0189
Title
Controlled Substances - Schedules
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0195
Title
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196 /CH0223
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Overdose Report
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0200 /CH0224
Title
Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Naloxone Medication Data
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0202
Title
State Board of Examiners in Optometry - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0209 /CH0225
Title
State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0216 /CH0226
Title
Evidence - Approval of Breath and Blood Tests for Alcohol, Drugs, or Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0168 /CH0220 Department of Health - ImmuNet and Statewide Advisory Commission on Immunizations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0174 /CH0221 Mortality and Quality Review Committee - Duties, Reports, and Data - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Budget and Taxation
1/25/2022 - 2:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0186 /CH0222 Maryland AIDS Drug Assistance Program Fund By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0189 Controlled Substances - Schedules By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0195 State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - House Refuses to Recede
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0196 /CH0223 Maryland Department of Health - Overdose Report By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Finance
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0200 /CH0224 Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Naloxone Medication Data By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Finance
1/27/2022 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0202 State Board of Examiners in Optometry - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Senate Requests House Recede
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0209 /CH0225 State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0216 /CH0226 Evidence - Approval of Breath and Blood Tests for Alcohol, Drugs, or Controlled Dangerous Substances By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:34 AM
Click to return on the top page