Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Health, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0019 /CH0416 (SB0216)
Title
Health Occupations - Nursing - Loan Repayment, Education, and Sunset Extension (Building Opportunities for Nurses Act of 2025)
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054 /CH0025 (SB0229/CH0026)
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission – User Fee Assessment – Repeal of Sunset
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0094 /CH0027 (SB0224/CH0028)
Title
Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs - Appeals and Membership of Standing Advisory Committee
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0170 /CH0029 (SB0213/CH0030)
Title
Health - Maternal and Child Health Population Health Improvement Fund - Use
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0256 /CH0031 (SB0217/CH0032)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Membership Alteration and Sunset Extensions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0290 (SB0115)
Title
Office of the Chief Medical Examiner - Disclosure of Autopsy Information and Maintenance of Investigative Database
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1104
Title
Maryland Department of Health - AHEAD Model Implementation - Electronic Health Care Transactions and Population Health Improvement Fund
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0115 (HB0290)
Title
Office of the Chief Medical Examiner - Disclosure of Autopsy Information and Maintenance of Investigative Database
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0213 /CH0030 (HB0170/CH0029)
Title
Health - Maternal and Child Health Population Health Improvement Fund - Use
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0216 (HB0019/CH0416)
Title
Health Occupations - Nursing - Loan Repayment, Education, and Sunset Extension (Building Opportunities for Nurses Act of 2025)
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0217 /CH0032 (HB0256/CH0031)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Membership Alteration and Sunset Extensions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0224 /CH0028 (HB0094/CH0027)
Title
Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs - Appeals and Membership of Standing Advisory Committee
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0229 /CH0026 (HB0054/CH0025)
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - User Fee Assessment - Repeal of Sunset
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0233
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Dispensers - Veterinarians
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0019 /CH0416 (SB0216) Health Occupations - Nursing - Loan Repayment, Education, and Sunset Extension (Building Opportunities for Nurses Act of 2025) By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Health and Government Operations
1/28/2025 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0054 /CH0025 (SB0229/CH0026) Health Services Cost Review Commission – User Fee Assessment – Repeal of Sunset By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
Health and Government Operations
1/15/2025 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0094 /CH0027 (SB0224/CH0028) Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs - Appeals and Membership of Standing Advisory Committee By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Health and Government Operations
1/22/2025 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0170 /CH0029 (SB0213/CH0030) Health - Maternal and Child Health Population Health Improvement Fund - Use By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 29
Health and Government Operations
1/15/2025 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0256 /CH0031 (SB0217/CH0032) Health Occupations Boards - Membership Alteration and Sunset Extensions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Health and Government Operations
1/30/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0290 (SB0115) Office of the Chief Medical Examiner - Disclosure of Autopsy Information and Maintenance of Investigative Database By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 1/22 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/22/2025 - 2:00 PM
HB1104 Maryland Department of Health - AHEAD Model Implementation - Electronic Health Care Transactions and Population Health Improvement Fund By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0115 (HB0290) Office of the Chief Medical Examiner - Disclosure of Autopsy Information and Maintenance of Investigative Database By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/16 at 3:00 p.m.
Finance
1/16/2025 - 3:00 PM
SB0213 /CH0030 (HB0170/CH0029) Health - Maternal and Child Health Population Health Improvement Fund - Use By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Finance
1/15/2025 - 10:30 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2025 - 2:15 PM
SB0216 (HB0019/CH0416) Health Occupations - Nursing - Loan Repayment, Education, and Sunset Extension (Building Opportunities for Nurses Act of 2025) By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
1/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0217 /CH0032 (HB0256/CH0031) Health Occupations Boards - Membership Alteration and Sunset Extensions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Finance
1/21/2025 - 3:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0224 /CH0028 (HB0094/CH0027) Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs - Appeals and Membership of Standing Advisory Committee By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 28
Finance
1/21/2025 - 3:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2025 - 2:15 PM
SB0229 /CH0026 (HB0054/CH0025) Health Services Cost Review Commission - User Fee Assessment - Repeal of Sunset By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26
Finance
1/15/2025 - 10:30 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2025 - 2:15 PM
SB0233 Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Dispensers - Veterinarians By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/8/2025 3:55 PM
Click to return on the top page