Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Department Of Labor

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0182 /CH0122
Title
State Board of Electricians - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0184 /CH0123
Title
State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air–Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors – Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0193 /CH0124
Title
State Board of Plumbing - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0199
Title
State Board of Architects - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0205 /CH0125
Title
Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0211 /CH0126
Title
State Board for Professional Engineers - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0213
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors – Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0217
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Loans - Payments and Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0219 /CH0127
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight – Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0182 /CH0122 State Board of Electricians - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0184 /CH0123 State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air–Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors – Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0193 /CH0124 State Board of Plumbing - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0199 State Board of Architects - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0205 /CH0125 Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Finance
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0211 /CH0126 State Board for Professional Engineers - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0213 State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors – Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Finance
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0217 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Loans - Payments and Fees By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - House Refuses to Recede
Finance
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0219 /CH0127 Office of Cemetery Oversight – Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Finance
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 2:01 PM
Click to return on the top page