Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Department Of Labor

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0063 /CH0083 (SB0261/CH0084)
Title
State Board of Public Accountancy - Sunset Extension and Report
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0078 (SB0209)
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Sunset Extension and Report
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0082 (SB0241)
Title
Cyber Maryland Program - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0092 /CH0085 (SB0263/CH0086)
Title
Heating, Ventilation, Air–Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors – License Restoration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 /CH0363 (SB0225)
Title
Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0264 (SB0218)
Title
Business Occupational and Professional Licenses - Suspension and Revocation for Workplace Fraud
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0209 (HB0078)
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Sunset Extension and Report
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0218 (HB0264)
Title
Business Occupational and Professional Licenses - Suspension and Revocation for Workplace Fraud
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0225 (HB0102/CH0363)
Title
Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Application Year and Participation of Self–Employed Individuals
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0241 (HB0082)
Title
Cyber Maryland Program - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0261 /CH0084 (HB0063/CH0083)
Title
State Board of Public Accountancy - Sunset Extension and Report
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0263 /CH0086 (HB0092/CH0085)
Title
Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - License Restoration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0063 /CH0083 (SB0261/CH0084) State Board of Public Accountancy - Sunset Extension and Report By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Economic Matters
1/22/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0078 (SB0209) State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Sunset Extension and Report By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Economic Matters
1/22/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0082 (SB0241) Cyber Maryland Program - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2025 - 2:00 PM
HB0092 /CH0085 (SB0263/CH0086) Heating, Ventilation, Air–Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors – License Restoration By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Economic Matters
1/22/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0102 /CH0363 (SB0225) Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Economic Matters
1/30/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0264 (SB0218) Business Occupational and Professional Licenses - Suspension and Revocation for Workplace Fraud By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
SB0209 (HB0078) State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Sunset Extension and Report By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Senate Requests House Recede
Finance
1/23/2025 - 3:45 PM
Economic Matters
SB0218 (HB0264) Business Occupational and Professional Licenses - Suspension and Revocation for Workplace Fraud By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0225 (HB0102/CH0363) Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Application Year and Participation of Self–Employed Individuals By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/29/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0241 (HB0082) Cyber Maryland Program - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/30/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0261 /CH0084 (HB0063/CH0083) State Board of Public Accountancy - Sunset Extension and Report By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/23/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0263 /CH0086 (HB0092/CH0085) Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - License Restoration By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/30/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/8/2025 3:51 PM
Click to return on the top page