Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Military

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0181 /CH0019 (SB0255/CH0020)
Title
Military Department – Chief of Staff and Aides – Appointment Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0228 (SB0246)
Title
Maryland Veterans Trust – Assistance to Members of the Maryland National Guard
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0246 (HB0228)
Title
Maryland Veterans Trust - Assistance to Members of the Maryland National Guard
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0255 /CH0020 (HB0181/CH0019)
Title
Military Department – Chief of Staff and Aides – Appointment Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0181 /CH0019 (SB0255/CH0020) Military Department – Chief of Staff and Aides – Appointment Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19
Health and Government Operations
1/21/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0228 (SB0246) Maryland Veterans Trust – Assistance to Members of the Maryland National Guard By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0246 (HB0228) Maryland Veterans Trust - Assistance to Members of the Maryland National Guard By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/23/2025 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0255 /CH0020 (HB0181/CH0019) Military Department – Chief of Staff and Aides – Appointment Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 20
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/23/2025 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2025 3:40 PM
Click to return on the top page