Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Natural Resources, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0040 /CH0045 (SB0258/CH0046)
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing Licenses and Stamps - Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0717 /CH0443
Title
Natural Resources - Public Lands - Acquisition, Staffing, Operations, and Funding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0719 /CH0433
Title
Natural Resources - State Boat Act - Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720 /CH0444
Title
Natural Resources - Repeal of Somers Cove Marina Commission and Improvement Fund and Alteration of Operations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258 /CH0046 (HB0040/CH0045)
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing Licenses and Stamps - Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0040 /CH0045 (SB0258/CH0046) Natural Resources - Fishing Licenses and Stamps - Alterations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2025 - 1:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0717 /CH0443 Natural Resources - Public Lands - Acquisition, Staffing, Operations, and Funding By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0719 /CH0433 Natural Resources - State Boat Act - Alterations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0720 /CH0444 Natural Resources - Repeal of Somers Cove Marina Commission and Improvement Fund and Alteration of Operations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0258 /CH0046 (HB0040/CH0045) Natural Resources - Fishing Licenses and Stamps - Alterations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/15/2025 2:50 PM
Click to return on the top page