Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Planning, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0272 /CH0061 (SB0236/CH0062)
Title
Maryland Department of Planning – Modernization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0279 /CH0059 (SB0245/CH0060)
Title
Municipalities - Annexation Resolutions - Submission to Department of Planning
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0286 /CH0063 (SB0266/CH0064)
Title
Local Comprehensive Planning and State Economic Growth, Resource Protection, and Planning Policy - Planning Principles
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0236 /CH0062 (HB0272/CH0061)
Title
Maryland Department of Planning - Modernization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0245 /CH0060 (HB0279/CH0059)
Title
Municipalities - Annexation Resolutions - Submission to Department of Planning
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0266 /CH0064 (HB0286/CH0063)
Title
Local Comprehensive Planning and State Economic Growth, Resource Protection, and Planning Policy - Planning Principles
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0272 /CH0061 (SB0236/CH0062) Maryland Department of Planning – Modernization By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2025 - 2:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0279 /CH0059 (SB0245/CH0060) Municipalities - Annexation Resolutions - Submission to Department of Planning By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0286 /CH0063 (SB0266/CH0064) Local Comprehensive Planning and State Economic Growth, Resource Protection, and Planning Policy - Planning Principles By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0236 /CH0062 (HB0272/CH0061) Maryland Department of Planning - Modernization By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/21/2025 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0245 /CH0060 (HB0279/CH0059) Municipalities - Annexation Resolutions - Submission to Department of Planning By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/21/2025 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0266 /CH0064 (HB0286/CH0063) Local Comprehensive Planning and State Economic Growth, Resource Protection, and Planning Policy - Planning Principles By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/21/2025 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2025 3:47 PM
Click to return on the top page