Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Public Safety And Correctional Services, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0123 /CH0087 (SB0197/CH0088)
Title
Maryland Correctional Training Commission – Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0779
Title
Correctional Services - Medication Review Committee - Administration of Psychotropic Medication to an Incarcerated Individual
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0197 /CH0088 (HB0123/CH0087)
Title
Maryland Correctional Training Commission - Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0123 /CH0087 (SB0197/CH0088) Maryland Correctional Training Commission – Membership By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Judiciary
1/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0779 Correctional Services - Medication Review Committee - Administration of Psychotropic Medication to an Incarcerated Individual By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2025 - 11:00 AM
SB0197 /CH0088 (HB0123/CH0087) Maryland Correctional Training Commission - Membership By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2025 3:51 PM
Click to return on the top page