Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Transportation, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0420 /CH0113
Title
Vehicle Laws - Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0430 /CH0371
Title
Criminal Law - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption and Possession in Motor Vehicles
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0064 /CH0015
Title
Controlled Hazardous Substance Vehicles - Display of Certificates
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0072 /CH0176
Title
Motor Vehicles - Damage to Highways from Overweight or Oversized Vehicles - Liability and Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073 /CH0018
Title
Vehicle Laws - Piling, Poles, Mill Logs, and Similar Cargo - Length, Overhang, and Fastening Standards
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0075 /CH0019
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Investigative Division - Issuance of Citations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0076
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Fee-Setting Authority - Miscellaneous Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0085 /CH0021
Title
Maryland Port Commission - Management Personnel Appointments - Operating and Managing Port Facilities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0087 /CH0179
Title
Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety Seats
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0420 /CH0113 Vehicle Laws - Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0430 /CH0371 Criminal Law - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption and Possession in Motor Vehicles By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0064 /CH0015 Controlled Hazardous Substance Vehicles - Display of Certificates By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 15
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0072 /CH0176 Motor Vehicles - Damage to Highways from Overweight or Oversized Vehicles - Liability and Penalties By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0073 /CH0018 Vehicle Laws - Piling, Poles, Mill Logs, and Similar Cargo - Length, Overhang, and Fastening Standards By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 18
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0075 /CH0019 Motor Vehicle Administration - Investigative Division - Issuance of Citations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0076 Motor Vehicle Administration - Fee-Setting Authority - Miscellaneous Fees By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
SB0085 /CH0021 Maryland Port Commission - Management Personnel Appointments - Operating and Managing Port Facilities By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Finance
1/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0087 /CH0179 Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety Seats By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM
Click to return on the top page