Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Transportation, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0020 (SB0198)
Title
Transportation – Consolidated Transportation Program – Prioritization (Transportation Investment Priorities Act of 2025)
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0046 /CH0364 (SB0222/CH0365)
Title
Public Health - Cannabis Public Health Advisory Council - Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0070 (SB0207/CH0366)
Title
Drunk and Drug-Impaired Driving and Failure to Remain at the Scene - Revocation of Driver's License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0080 (SB0190)
Title
Land Use - Transit-Oriented Development - Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0189 /CH0049 (SB0187/CH0050)
Title
Drunk Driving - Commercial Driver's Licenses - Disqualification From Driving
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0225 /CH0051 (SB0203/CH0052)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Exceptional Hauling Permits for Farm Products
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284 /CH0053 (SB0196/CH0054)
Title
Procurement – Electronic Transactions – Clarification of Fees Due
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0288 /CH0055 (SB0210/CH0056)
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority – Tolls, Fees, and Other Charges – Temporary Adjustments
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0187 /CH0050 (HB0189/CH0049)
Title
Drunk Driving - Commercial Driver's Licenses - Disqualification From Driving
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0190 (HB0080)
Title
Land Use - Transit-Oriented Development - Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196 /CH0054 (HB0284/CH0053)
Title
Procurement - Electronic Transactions - Clarification of Fees Due
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0198 (HB0020)
Title
Transportation - Consolidated Transportation Program - Prioritization (Transportation Investment Priorities Act of 2025)
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0203 /CH0052 (HB0225/CH0051)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Exceptional Hauling Permits for Farm Products
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0207 /CH0366 (HB0070)
Title
Drunk and Drug-Impaired Driving and Failure to Remain at the Scene - Revocation of Driver's License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0210 /CH0056 (HB0288/CH0055)
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Tolls, Fees, and Other Charges - Temporary Adjustments
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0222 /CH0365 (HB0046/CH0364)
Title
Public Health – Cannabis Public Health Advisory Council – Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0020 (SB0198) Transportation – Consolidated Transportation Program – Prioritization (Transportation Investment Priorities Act of 2025) By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0046 /CH0364 (SB0222/CH0365) Public Health - Cannabis Public Health Advisory Council - Membership By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Health and Government Operations
1/22/2025 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0070 (SB0207/CH0366) Drunk and Drug-Impaired Driving and Failure to Remain at the Scene - Revocation of Driver's License By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/29/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0080 (SB0190) Land Use - Transit-Oriented Development - Alterations By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2025 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0189 /CH0049 (SB0187/CH0050) Drunk Driving - Commercial Driver's Licenses - Disqualification From Driving By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Judiciary
1/29/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0225 /CH0051 (SB0203/CH0052) Vehicle Laws - Exceptional Hauling Permits for Farm Products By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0284 /CH0053 (SB0196/CH0054) Procurement – Electronic Transactions – Clarification of Fees Due By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2025 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0288 /CH0055 (SB0210/CH0056) Maryland Transportation Authority – Tolls, Fees, and Other Charges – Temporary Adjustments By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2025 - 1:30 PM
Finance
SB0187 /CH0050 (HB0189/CH0049) Drunk Driving - Commercial Driver's Licenses - Disqualification From Driving By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0190 (HB0080) Land Use - Transit-Oriented Development - Alterations By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 10:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2025 - 10:30 AM
SB0196 /CH0054 (HB0284/CH0053) Procurement - Electronic Transactions - Clarification of Fees Due By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2025 - 11:30 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0198 (HB0020) Transportation - Consolidated Transportation Program - Prioritization (Transportation Investment Priorities Act of 2025) By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 10:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2025 - 10:30 AM
SB0203 /CH0052 (HB0225/CH0051) Vehicle Laws - Exceptional Hauling Permits for Farm Products By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0207 /CH0366 (HB0070) Drunk and Drug-Impaired Driving and Failure to Remain at the Scene - Revocation of Driver's License By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2025 - 3:15 PM
SB0210 /CH0056 (HB0288/CH0055) Maryland Transportation Authority - Tolls, Fees, and Other Charges - Temporary Adjustments By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
Finance
1/29/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0222 /CH0365 (HB0046/CH0364) Public Health – Cannabis Public Health Advisory Council – Membership By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Finance
1/16/2025 - 3:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2025 - 2:15 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/8/2025 3:51 PM
Click to return on the top page