Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Veterans Affairs, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 /CH0105
Title
Military Personnel and Veteran-Owned Small Business No-Interest Loan Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0750
Title
Maryland Veterans Trust Fund - Income Tax Checkoff
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1390 /CH0681
Title
Maryland Veterans Trust and Fund - Establishment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0356 /CH0105 Military Personnel and Veteran-Owned Small Business No-Interest Loan Program By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Economic Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0750 Maryland Veterans Trust Fund - Income Tax Checkoff By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1390 /CH0681 Maryland Veterans Trust and Fund - Establishment By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 681
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM
Click to return on the top page