Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Economic Matters Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0012 /CH0057 (SB0214/CH0058)
Title
Cannabis - Sale and Distribution - Tetrahydrocannabinol Offenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0030 (SB0228/CH0415)
Title
Limited Line Credit Insurance - Qualification of Applicants
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0063 /CH0083 (SB0261/CH0084)
Title
State Board of Public Accountancy - Sunset Extension and Report
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0078 (SB0209)
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Sunset Extension and Report
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0092 /CH0085 (SB0263/CH0086)
Title
Heating, Ventilation, Air–Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors – License Restoration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 /CH0363 (SB0225)
Title
Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0112 (SB0220)
Title
Alcohol, Tobacco, and Cannabis Commission – Enforcement Activities – Memorandum of Understanding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0119 (SB0243)
Title
State Government - Research Duties and Advisory Committee on Black Males - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0193 (SB0219)
Title
Uninsured Employers' Fund - Assessments and Special Monitor
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0239 /CH0079 (SB0184/CH0080)
Title
Charitable Organizations - Late Fees and Registration - Suspension and Cancellation Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0264 (SB0218)
Title
Business Occupational and Professional Licenses - Suspension and Revocation for Workplace Fraud
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1273
Title
Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund and Customer-Sited Solar Program - Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0132 (SB0215/CH0120)
Title
Cannabis – On–Site Consumption Establishments and Cannabis Events
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204 (SB0221)
Title
Cannabis - Wholesaler License - Establishment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575 /CH0099
Title
Maryland Protecting Opportunities and Regional Trade (PORT) Act – Reports of Attorney General – Frequency
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0012 /CH0057 (SB0214/CH0058) Cannabis - Sale and Distribution - Tetrahydrocannabinol Offenses By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Economic Matters
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0030 (SB0228/CH0415) Limited Line Credit Insurance - Qualification of Applicants By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
1/22/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0063 /CH0083 (SB0261/CH0084) State Board of Public Accountancy - Sunset Extension and Report By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Economic Matters
1/22/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0078 (SB0209) State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Sunset Extension and Report By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Economic Matters
1/22/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0092 /CH0085 (SB0263/CH0086) Heating, Ventilation, Air–Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors – License Restoration By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Economic Matters
1/22/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0102 /CH0363 (SB0225) Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Economic Matters
1/30/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0112 (SB0220) Alcohol, Tobacco, and Cannabis Commission – Enforcement Activities – Memorandum of Understanding By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/29/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0119 (SB0243) State Government - Research Duties and Advisory Committee on Black Males - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB0193 (SB0219) Uninsured Employers' Fund - Assessments and Special Monitor By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Economic Matters
2/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0239 /CH0079 (SB0184/CH0080) Charitable Organizations - Late Fees and Registration - Suspension and Cancellation Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Economic Matters
1/22/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0264 (SB0218) Business Occupational and Professional Licenses - Suspension and Revocation for Workplace Fraud By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1273 Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund and Customer-Sited Solar Program - Alterations By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0132 (SB0215/CH0120) Cannabis – On–Site Consumption Establishments and Cannabis Events By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0204 (SB0221) Cannabis - Wholesaler License - Establishment By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0575 /CH0099 Maryland Protecting Opportunities and Regional Trade (PORT) Act – Reports of Attorney General – Frequency By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Economic Matters
2/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/8/2025 3:51 PM
Click to return on the top page