Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Education, Health, And Environmental Affairs Com, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0168 /CH0220
Title
Department of Health - ImmuNet and Statewide Advisory Commission on Immunizations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0171 /CH0093
Title
Environment - Public Participation Modernization Act
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178 /CH0087
Title
Program Open Space - Local Projects - Federal Funds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0182 /CH0122
Title
State Board of Electricians - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0184 /CH0123
Title
State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air–Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors – Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0186 /CH0222
Title
Maryland AIDS Drug Assistance Program Fund
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0190 /CH0088
Title
Tidal Fisheries Advisory Commission - Membership Term - Alteration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0193 /CH0124
Title
State Board of Plumbing - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0195
Title
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0199
Title
State Board of Architects - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0202
Title
State Board of Examiners in Optometry - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0204 /CH0128
Title
State Libraries – Maryland State Library Board – Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206 /CH0092
Title
Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund - Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0209 /CH0225
Title
State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0211 /CH0126
Title
State Board for Professional Engineers - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0168 /CH0220 Department of Health - ImmuNet and Statewide Advisory Commission on Immunizations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0171 /CH0093 Environment - Public Participation Modernization Act By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2022 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0178 /CH0087 Program Open Space - Local Projects - Federal Funds By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2022 - 2:30 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2022 - 3:00 PM
SB0182 /CH0122 State Board of Electricians - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0184 /CH0123 State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air–Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors – Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0186 /CH0222 Maryland AIDS Drug Assistance Program Fund By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0190 /CH0088 Tidal Fisheries Advisory Commission - Membership Term - Alteration By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2022 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0193 /CH0124 State Board of Plumbing - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0195 State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - House Refuses to Recede
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0199 State Board of Architects - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0202 State Board of Examiners in Optometry - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Senate Requests House Recede
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0204 /CH0128 State Libraries – Maryland State Library Board – Membership By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0206 /CH0092 Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund - Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2022 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0209 /CH0225 State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0211 /CH0126 State Board for Professional Engineers - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:33 AM
Click to return on the top page