Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Finance Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054
Title
Local Government – Clean Energy Loan Programs – Grid Resilience Projects
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0086 /CH0098
Title
Correctional Education – Changes to Mandatory Education Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0106
Title
Licensing – Good Standing With the State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Requirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0110 /CH0103
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Notices - Alteration of Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0120 /CH0104
Title
Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0152
Title
Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund – Use of Funds and Electric Vehicle Excise Tax Credits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0170
Title
Transportation-Related Property - Prohibited Acts and Enforcement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206
Title
State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0219 /CH0100
Title
Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0226 /CH0105
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Delivery of Notices and Other Communications by Electronic Means
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0230
Title
Maryland Port Administration - Land Acquisition and Payment to Counties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0235
Title
Major Information Technology Development Project Fund – Use of Funds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0251 /CH0101
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256
Title
Arts and Entertainment Districts – Artistic Work and Arts and Entertainment Enterprise – Definitions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0272
Title
Insurance - Claim Payment - Clarification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0281 /CH0102
Title
Office of the Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0054 Local Government – Clean Energy Loan Programs – Grid Resilience Projects By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Kelley)
Finance
SB0086 /CH0098 Correctional Education – Changes to Mandatory Education Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Finance
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0106 Licensing – Good Standing With the State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Requirement By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (92-42)
Finance
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0110 /CH0103 Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Notices - Alteration of Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Finance
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
Economic Matters
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0120 /CH0104 Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Finance
1/19/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0152 Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund – Use of Funds and Electric Vehicle Excise Tax Credits By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/19/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0170 Transportation-Related Property - Prohibited Acts and Enforcement By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
1/19/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0206 State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0219 /CH0100 Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Finance
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0226 /CH0105 Maryland Insurance Administration - Delivery of Notices and Other Communications by Electronic Means By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Finance
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
Economic Matters
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0230 Maryland Port Administration - Land Acquisition and Payment to Counties By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/19/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0235 Major Information Technology Development Project Fund – Use of Funds By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0251 /CH0101 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Finance
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0256 Arts and Entertainment Districts – Artistic Work and Arts and Entertainment Enterprise – Definitions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0272 Insurance - Claim Payment - Clarification By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/19/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0281 /CH0102 Office of the Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Finance
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:21 PM
Click to return on the top page