Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Finance Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0167 /CH0120
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Enforcement Authority - Payment of Claims
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0169
Title
State Autism Strategy – Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0170
Title
Title Insurance – Insurers and Insurance Producers – Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0175 /CH0227
Title
Fiduciary Institutions - Investigation of Financial Abuse and Financial Exploitation - Records Disclosure
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0177
Title
Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Payments to Former Employees of Bethlehem Steel Corporation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0180 /CH0229
Title
Insurance - Conformity With Federal Law - The No Surprises Act and Other Provisions of the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2021
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0185 /CH0230
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Virtual Hearings
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0188 /CH0121
Title
Insurance - Managing General Agents - Review Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0191 /CH0116
Title
Maryland Department of Commerce - Reporting Requirements and Purple Line Construction Zone Grant Program - Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196 /CH0223
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Overdose Report
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0200 /CH0224
Title
Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Naloxone Medication Data
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0205 /CH0125
Title
Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0207 /CH0231
Title
Insurance Carriers and Managed Care Organizations - Cybersecurity Standards
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0213
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors – Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0217
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Loans - Payments and Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0219 /CH0127
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight – Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0167 /CH0120 Maryland Insurance Administration - Enforcement Authority - Payment of Claims By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0169 State Autism Strategy – Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/27/2022 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
4/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0170 Title Insurance – Insurers and Insurance Producers – Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0175 /CH0227 Fiduciary Institutions - Investigation of Financial Abuse and Financial Exploitation - Records Disclosure By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0177 Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Payments to Former Employees of Bethlehem Steel Corporation By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0180 /CH0229 Insurance - Conformity With Federal Law - The No Surprises Act and Other Provisions of the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2021 By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0185 /CH0230 Maryland Insurance Administration - Virtual Hearings By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0188 /CH0121 Insurance - Managing General Agents - Review Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0191 /CH0116 Maryland Department of Commerce - Reporting Requirements and Purple Line Construction Zone Grant Program - Alterations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Finance
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0196 /CH0223 Maryland Department of Health - Overdose Report By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Finance
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0200 /CH0224 Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Naloxone Medication Data By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Finance
1/27/2022 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0205 /CH0125 Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Finance
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0207 /CH0231 Insurance Carriers and Managed Care Organizations - Cybersecurity Standards By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0213 State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors – Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Finance
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0217 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Loans - Payments and Fees By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - House Refuses to Recede
Finance
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0219 /CH0127 Office of Cemetery Oversight – Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Finance
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:33 AM
Click to return on the top page