Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Montgomery County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0231
Title
Montgomery County - Automated Traffic Enforcement - Implementing Agency MC 18-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0232
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor (Clubhouse/Lodge) License - Manufacturer's Licenses MC 23-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 7 Micro-Brewery License and Licenses in the Town of Kensington MC 07-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0239
Title
Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class D Beer and Wine License – Farm Breweries and Limited Wineries MC 21–22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0240
Title
Montgomery County – Board of Education – Membership MC 16–22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0241
Title
Montgomery County - Damascus - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License Referendum MC 12-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242
Title
Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Consumption Only Marketplace Licenses MC 06–22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0243
Title
Montgomery County – Board of Education – Student Member Scholarship MC 05–22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0362
Title
Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 13-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0380
Title
Montgomery County Board of Education – Election of Members MC 04–22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0485 /CH0458
Title
Montgomery County - Deer Hunting - Sundays MC 25-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0503 /CH0105
Title
Montgomery County - Board of Education Residence Districts - Ken Gar Neighborhood MC 26-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0811
Title
Montgomery County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Maryland Route 200 (Intercounty Connector) MC 22-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0812
Title
Montgomery County – Board of Education – Data Disaggregation Policy and Racial Disparity Comparisons MC 24–22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0813 /CH0216
Title
Montgomery County – Speed and School Bus Monitoring Systems MC 03–22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0918
Title
Montgomery County - Landlord and Tenant - Tenant Access to Cable Television Systems and Equipment MC 01-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1340 /CH0283
Title
Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 08-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0231 Montgomery County - Automated Traffic Enforcement - Implementing Agency MC 18-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0232 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor (Clubhouse/Lodge) License - Manufacturer's Licenses MC 23-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0233 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 7 Micro-Brewery License and Licenses in the Town of Kensington MC 07-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0239 Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class D Beer and Wine License – Farm Breweries and Limited Wineries MC 21–22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0240 Montgomery County – Board of Education – Membership MC 16–22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0241 Montgomery County - Damascus - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License Referendum MC 12-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0242 Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Consumption Only Marketplace Licenses MC 06–22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0243 Montgomery County – Board of Education – Student Member Scholarship MC 05–22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0362 Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 13-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0380 Montgomery County Board of Education – Election of Members MC 04–22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0485 /CH0458 Montgomery County - Deer Hunting - Sundays MC 25-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0503 /CH0105 Montgomery County - Board of Education Residence Districts - Ken Gar Neighborhood MC 26-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/16/2022 - 10:00 AM
Reapportionment and Redistricting
4/04/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB0811 Montgomery County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Maryland Route 200 (Intercounty Connector) MC 22-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB0812 Montgomery County – Board of Education – Data Disaggregation Policy and Racial Disparity Comparisons MC 24–22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0813 /CH0216 Montgomery County – Speed and School Bus Monitoring Systems MC 03–22 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0918 Montgomery County - Landlord and Tenant - Tenant Access to Cable Television Systems and Equipment MC 01-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) and Hearing canceled (Finance)
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1340 /CH0283 Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 08-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2022 3:23 PM
Click to return on the top page