Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Prince George's County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306 /CH0677
Title
Prince George's County - Economic Development - Workgroup on Independent Innovation in Prince George's County - Establishment PG 402-24
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0307 /CH0994 (SB0009/CH0995)
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Nonprofit Organizations PG 304-24
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0358 /CH0977 (SB0151/CH0978)
Title
Prince George's County - Workgroup on Health and Wellness PG 409-24
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0360
Title
Prince George's County - Retail Service Station Dealers - Fuel Service PG 410-24
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0364 /CH0678
Title
Prince George's County - Stop Sign Monitoring Systems - Authorization PG 301-24
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0374
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Lounge License PG 303-24
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0376 /CH0372
Title
Study on the Feasibility of Relocating the Prince George's County Public School System Headquarters PG 501-24
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0384
Title
Prince George’s County – Business Improvement Districts – Sale of Commercial Property PG 403–24
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0388
Title
Prince George's County - Law Enforcement - Sound Level Meters PG 305-24
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0395
Title
Prince George's County - Early Childhood Education Program and High School Child Care Centers - Established PG 504-24
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0396 /CH0969
Title
Prince George's County - Sales and Use Tax on Energy and Fuel - Use of Revenue PG 407-24
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0398 /CH0970
Title
Prince George's County - Taxes on Telecommunications Services - Use of Revenue PG 406-24
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0399
Title
Prince George's County - High School Metal Detector Program - Established PG 302-24
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816 (SB0051/CH1043)
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Renewal PG 308-24
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0817 /CH1022 (SB0066/CH1023)
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of License Near a Place of Worship or School PG 307-24
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0818 (SB0721)
Title
Prince George’s County – Income Tax – Credit for Employers Providing Parental Engagement Leave PG 412–24
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0821 /CH0303 (SB0654/CH0304)
Title
Prince George's County - Student Support - Specialist Networks and Success Action Plans (Student Supports and Success Act) PG 502-24
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0838 /CH0373
Title
Prince George's County Family Child Care Home Expansion Grant Program - Establishment PG 505-24
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0974
Title
Prince George's County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Indian Head Highway PG 306-24
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1246
Title
Prince George's County - Income Tax Credit for Parent and Guardian Volunteers in Elementary and Secondary Schools PG 411-24
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0306 /CH0677 Prince George's County - Economic Development - Workgroup on Independent Innovation in Prince George's County - Establishment PG 402-24 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 677
Ways and Means
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0307 /CH0994 (SB0009/CH0995) Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Nonprofit Organizations PG 304-24 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 994
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0358 /CH0977 (SB0151/CH0978) Prince George's County - Workgroup on Health and Wellness PG 409-24 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 977
Health and Government Operations
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0360 Prince George's County - Retail Service Station Dealers - Fuel Service PG 410-24 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0364 /CH0678 Prince George's County - Stop Sign Monitoring Systems - Authorization PG 301-24 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 678
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0374 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Lounge License PG 303-24 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0376 /CH0372 Study on the Feasibility of Relocating the Prince George's County Public School System Headquarters PG 501-24 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Appropriations
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0384 Prince George’s County – Business Improvement Districts – Sale of Commercial Property PG 403–24 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0388 Prince George's County - Law Enforcement - Sound Level Meters PG 305-24 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
HB0395 Prince George's County - Early Childhood Education Program and High School Child Care Centers - Established PG 504-24 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0396 /CH0969 Prince George's County - Sales and Use Tax on Energy and Fuel - Use of Revenue PG 407-24 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 969
Ways and Means
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0398 /CH0970 Prince George's County - Taxes on Telecommunications Services - Use of Revenue PG 406-24 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 970
Ways and Means
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0399 Prince George's County - High School Metal Detector Program - Established PG 302-24 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
Ways and Means
HB0816 (SB0051/CH1043) Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Renewal PG 308-24 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - House Requests Senate Recede
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0817 /CH1022 (SB0066/CH1023) Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of License Near a Place of Worship or School PG 307-24 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1022
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0818 (SB0721) Prince George’s County – Income Tax – Credit for Employers Providing Parental Engagement Leave PG 412–24 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0821 /CH0303 (SB0654/CH0304) Prince George's County - Student Support - Specialist Networks and Success Action Plans (Student Supports and Success Act) PG 502-24 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Ways and Means
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0838 /CH0373 Prince George's County Family Child Care Home Expansion Grant Program - Establishment PG 505-24 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Ways and Means
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0974 Prince George's County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Indian Head Highway PG 306-24 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1246 Prince George's County - Income Tax Credit for Parent and Guardian Volunteers in Elementary and Secondary Schools PG 411-24 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/23/2024 5:13 PM
Click to return on the top page