Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

President, The

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0491
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2022)
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0492 (HB0590)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2021, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, and 2020
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0493 (HB0589)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0039 (HB0612)
Title
Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0567 (HB0731)
Title
Telehealth Services - Expansion
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0568 (HB0732)
Title
Health Care Practitioners – Telehealth – Out–of–State Health Care Practitioners
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0569 (HB0730)
Title
Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards - Applications and Renewals
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0570 (HB0737)
Title
Emergency Services – Exposure to Contagious Diseases and Viruses – Notification and Other Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 (HB0736)
Title
Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0572 (HB0733)
Title
Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2021
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0573 (HB0735)
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Correctional Officers, Law Enforcement Officers, and Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0574 (HB0734)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0575 (HB0741)
Title
Maryland Environmental Service - Officers, Board of Directors, and Responsibilities - Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0576 (HB0740)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2021
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0339
Title
Department of Commerce - Sister-State Relationships - Maintenance and Development
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0524 (HB0739)
Title
Environment - Multidefendant Oil and Hazardous Substance Pollution Cases - Effect of Settlement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0530 (HB0729)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Filing Surcharge and Prohibited Lease Provisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0657 (HB0848)
Title
Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to Appear
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0878
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0965 (HB1372/CH0055)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SS0001
Title
Implementation of Modified Procedures Due to COVID–19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0491 Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2022) By Request - Administration 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
SB0492 (HB0590) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2021, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, and 2020 By Request - Administration 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
SB0493 (HB0589) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021 By Request - Administration 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0496 /CH0039 (HB0612) Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act By Request - Administration 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0567 (HB0731) Telehealth Services - Expansion By Request - Administration 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0568 (HB0732) Health Care Practitioners – Telehealth – Out–of–State Health Care Practitioners By Request - Administration 3 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0569 (HB0730) Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards - Applications and Renewals By Request - Administration 3 2 In the House - Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0570 (HB0737) Emergency Services – Exposure to Contagious Diseases and Viruses – Notification and Other Requirements By Request - Administration 3 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Finance
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0571 (HB0736) Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact By Request - Administration 3 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0572 (HB0733) Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2021 By Request - Administration 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0573 (HB0735) Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Correctional Officers, Law Enforcement Officers, and Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act) By Request - Administration 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0574 (HB0734) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income By Request - Administration 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0575 (HB0741) Maryland Environmental Service - Officers, Board of Directors, and Responsibilities - Alterations By Request - Administration 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0576 (HB0740) Building Opportunity Act of 2021 By Request - Administration 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
SB0339 Department of Commerce - Sister-State Relationships - Maintenance and Development By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
SB0524 (HB0739) Environment - Multidefendant Oil and Hazardous Substance Pollution Cases - Effect of Settlement By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0530 (HB0729) Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Filing Surcharge and Prohibited Lease Provisions By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0657 (HB0848) Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to Appear By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 12:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2021 - 12:30 PM
SB0877 Annual Corrective Bill By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0878 Annual Curative Bill By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0965 (HB1372/CH0055) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 3:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2021 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SS0001 Implementation of Modified Procedures Due to COVID–19 By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - First Reading
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 12:35 PM
Click to return on the top page