Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Baltimore County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 /CH0357 (SB0451/CH0358)
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Nonstudent Member Compensation and Student Member Scholarships - Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0495 /CH0356 (SB0078)
Title
Education - Baltimore County School Board Nominating Commission - Publishing and Meetings Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0741 /CH0616 (SB0804/CH0615)
Title
Northwest Baltimore County Sports Tourism Facility - Feasibility Study
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213 /CH0991 (SB0934)
Title
Baltimore County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1269 /CH1037
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications - Notice
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0108 /CH0357 (SB0451/CH0358) Baltimore County Board of Education - Nonstudent Member Compensation and Student Member Scholarships - Alterations By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Ways and Means
1/25/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0495 /CH0356 (SB0078) Education - Baltimore County School Board Nominating Commission - Publishing and Meetings Requirements By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Ways and Means
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0741 /CH0616 (SB0804/CH0615) Northwest Baltimore County Sports Tourism Facility - Feasibility Study By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Appropriations
2/28/2024 - 12:30 PM
Finance
HB1213 /CH0991 (SB0934) Baltimore County - Sheriff - Salary By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 991
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1269 /CH1037 Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications - Notice By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1037
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/23/2024 5:20 PM
Click to return on the top page