Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Calvert County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0842 /CH0604
Title
Calvert County - Hotel Rental Tax - Distribution of Revenue
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0851
Title
Marine Contractor License – Performance of Services – Licensing Requirements and Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0886 /CH0761
Title
Calvert County - Board of License Commissioners - Compensation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0893 /CH0617 (SB0442)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0913
Title
Calvert County - Procurement - Local Preference
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0914 /CH0104
Title
Calvert County - Procurement - Award of Multiyear Contracts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0842 /CH0604 Calvert County - Hotel Rental Tax - Distribution of Revenue By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 604
Ways and Means
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0851 Marine Contractor License – Performance of Services – Licensing Requirements and Fees By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0886 /CH0761 Calvert County - Board of License Commissioners - Compensation By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 761
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0893 /CH0617 (SB0442) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 617
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0913 Calvert County - Procurement - Local Preference By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB0914 /CH0104 Calvert County - Procurement - Award of Multiyear Contracts By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:32 PM
Click to return on the top page