Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Environment And Transportation Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0882 /CH0089
Title
Natural Resources – Pocomoke River Wildland – Alteration of Boundaries
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0894
Title
Transportation Electrification and Modernization (TEAM) Act
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Opportunity Zone Fund - Establishment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0882 /CH0089 Natural Resources – Pocomoke River Wildland – Alteration of Boundaries By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0894 Transportation Electrification and Modernization (TEAM) Act By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0929 Department of Housing and Community Development - Opportunity Zone Fund - Establishment By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:47 PM
Click to return on the top page