Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Finance Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0167
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Enforcement Authority - Payment of Claims
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0169
Title
State Autism Strategy – Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0170
Title
Title Insurance – Insurers and Insurance Producers – Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0175
Title
Fiduciary Institutions - Investigation of Financial Abuse and Financial Exploitation - Records Disclosure
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0177
Title
Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Payments to Former Employees of Bethlehem Steel Corporation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0180
Title
Insurance - Conformity With Federal Law - The No Surprises Act and Other Provisions of the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2021
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0185
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Virtual Hearings
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0188
Title
Insurance - Managing General Agents - Review Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0191
Title
Maryland Department of Commerce - Transparency and Efficiency in Reporting Act
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Overdose Report
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0200
Title
Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Naloxone Medication Data
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0205
Title
Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0207
Title
Insurance Carriers - Cybersecurity Standards
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0213
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors – Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0217
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Loans - Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0219
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight – Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0167 Maryland Insurance Administration - Enforcement Authority - Payment of Claims By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0169 State Autism Strategy – Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Finance
1/27/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0170 Title Insurance – Insurers and Insurance Producers – Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0175 Fiduciary Institutions - Investigation of Financial Abuse and Financial Exploitation - Records Disclosure By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0177 Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Payments to Former Employees of Bethlehem Steel Corporation By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0180 Insurance - Conformity With Federal Law - The No Surprises Act and Other Provisions of the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2021 By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0185 Maryland Insurance Administration - Virtual Hearings By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0188 Insurance - Managing General Agents - Review Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0191 Maryland Department of Commerce - Transparency and Efficiency in Reporting Act By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0196 Maryland Department of Health - Overdose Report By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0200 Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Naloxone Medication Data By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Finance
1/27/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0205 Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Finance
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0207 Insurance Carriers - Cybersecurity Standards By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0213 State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors – Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Finance
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0217 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Loans - Fees By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0219 Office of Cemetery Oversight – Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Finance
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 1/14/2022 7:07 PM
Click to return on the top page