Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Harford County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0465 /CH0754 (SB0482)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0493 /CH0756 (SB0481)
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Service Under Stadium License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0520 (SB0483)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Annual Fee
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 /CH0569
Title
Harford County Board of Education - Appointment of Members - Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0667 /CH0757
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses - Restaurants
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0465 /CH0754 (SB0482) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 754
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0493 /CH0756 (SB0481) Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Service Under Stadium License By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 756
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0520 (SB0483) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Annual Fee By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0603 /CH0569 Harford County Board of Education - Appointment of Members - Alterations By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 569
Ways and Means
2/17/2022 - 3:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0667 /CH0757 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses - Restaurants By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 757
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:31 PM
Click to return on the top page