Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Montgomery County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0231
Title
Montgomery County - Automated Traffic Enforcement - Implementing Agency MC 18-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0232
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor (Clubhouse/Lodge) License - Manufacturer's Licenses MC 23-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233
Title
Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 7 Micro–Brewery License MC 07–22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0239
Title
Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class D Beer and Wine License – Farm Breweries and Limited Wineries MC 21–22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0240
Title
Montgomery County – Board of Education – Membership MC 16–22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0241
Title
Montgomery County - Damascus - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License Referendum MC 12-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242
Title
Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Consumption Only Marketplace Licenses MC 06–22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0243
Title
Montgomery County – Board of Education – Student Member Scholarship MC 05–22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0362
Title
Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 13-22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0380
Title
Montgomery County Board of Education – Election of Members MC 04–22
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0231 Montgomery County - Automated Traffic Enforcement - Implementing Agency MC 18-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0232 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor (Clubhouse/Lodge) License - Manufacturer's Licenses MC 23-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0233 Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 7 Micro–Brewery License MC 07–22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0239 Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class D Beer and Wine License – Farm Breweries and Limited Wineries MC 21–22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0240 Montgomery County – Board of Education – Membership MC 16–22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0241 Montgomery County - Damascus - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License Referendum MC 12-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0242 Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Consumption Only Marketplace Licenses MC 06–22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0243 Montgomery County – Board of Education – Student Member Scholarship MC 05–22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0362 Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 13-22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0380 Montgomery County Board of Education – Election of Members MC 04–22 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 1/25/2022 5:04 PM
Click to return on the top page