Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

St. Mary's County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0474 /CH0755
Title
St. Mary's County - Leonardtown - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Place of Worship Distance Restriction
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0475
Title
St. Mary's County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0516
Title
St. Mary's County Human Relations Commission - Equal Treatment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0522 /CH0597
Title
St. Mary's County - Tax Sales - Auctioneer Expenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0523
Title
St. Mary’s County – Newspaper or Newspaper in General Circulation – Definition
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0527 /CH0432
Title
St. Mary's County - Emergency Services Applicants - Polygraph Examinations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0474 /CH0755 St. Mary's County - Leonardtown - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Place of Worship Distance Restriction By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 755
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0475 St. Mary's County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0516 St. Mary's County Human Relations Commission - Equal Treatment By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Washington) Adopted
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0522 /CH0597 St. Mary's County - Tax Sales - Auctioneer Expenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 597
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0523 St. Mary’s County – Newspaper or Newspaper in General Circulation – Definition By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0527 /CH0432 St. Mary's County - Emergency Services Applicants - Polygraph Examinations By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Judiciary
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:25 PM
Click to return on the top page