Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Ways And Means Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0041 /CH0282 (SB0267/CH0283)
Title
Election Law - Petitions for the Formation of a New Political Party - Process
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0059 /CH0231 (SB0192)
Title
Property Tax – Tax Sales – Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0075 /CH0126 (SB0262/CH0125)
Title
Election Law – Special Elections
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090 (SB0235)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Project Restore Program - Establishment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0101 (SB0204/CH0230)
Title
Property Tax - Deadline to Set County and Municipal Corporation Tax Rates - Alteration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133 /CH0071 (SB0183/CH0072)
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Notification of Constant Yield Tax Rate - Alteration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0150 /CH0319 (SB0252/CH0318)
Title
Child Care Centers - Certificated Staff Ratio Requirement - Alteration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0199 /CH0280 (SB0257/CH0279)
Title
Election Law - Notice to Permanent Absentee Voters
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0274 (SB0259/CH0281)
Title
Election Law - Local Boards of Elections - Election Plan Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0617
Title
Comptroller - Recording and Monitoring Telephone Calls - Clarification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0619
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Sales Between Cannabis Businesses and Cannabis Nurseries - Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1265
Title
Education - Reportable Offenses and Prohibited Behavior on School Grounds - Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0614
Title
Local Earned Income Tax Credit - Calculation - County Income Tax Rate
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0041 /CH0282 (SB0267/CH0283) Election Law - Petitions for the Formation of a New Political Party - Process By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Ways and Means
1/21/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0059 /CH0231 (SB0192) Property Tax – Tax Sales – Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Ways and Means
1/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0075 /CH0126 (SB0262/CH0125) Election Law – Special Elections By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Ways and Means
1/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0090 (SB0235) Housing and Community Development - Project Restore Program - Establishment By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/23/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0101 (SB0204/CH0230) Property Tax - Deadline to Set County and Municipal Corporation Tax Rates - Alteration By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/21/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0133 /CH0071 (SB0183/CH0072) State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Notification of Constant Yield Tax Rate - Alteration By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Ways and Means
1/21/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0150 /CH0319 (SB0252/CH0318) Child Care Centers - Certificated Staff Ratio Requirement - Alteration By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Ways and Means
1/29/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0199 /CH0280 (SB0257/CH0279) Election Law - Notice to Permanent Absentee Voters By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Ways and Means
1/21/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0274 (SB0259/CH0281) Election Law - Local Boards of Elections - Election Plan Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/21/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0617 Comptroller - Recording and Monitoring Telephone Calls - Clarification By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0619 Sales and Use Tax - Sales Between Cannabis Businesses and Cannabis Nurseries - Exemption By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1265 Education - Reportable Offenses and Prohibited Behavior on School Grounds - Alterations By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Ways and Means
3/05/2025 - 1:15 PM
Judiciary
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0614 Local Earned Income Tax Credit - Calculation - County Income Tax Rate By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/8/2025 3:45 PM
Click to return on the top page