Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Washington County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0503 (HB0481)
Title
Washington County - Board of License Commissioners - Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0504 (HB0478/CH0427)
Title
Hagerstown Community College Police Force - Jurisdiction
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0580 (HB0749/CH0600)
Title
Washington County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0596 /CH0428 (HB0750/CH0236)
Title
Property Tax Exemption and Payment in Lieu of Taxes - The Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility, Inc.
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0503 (HB0481) Washington County - Board of License Commissioners - Membership By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
2/21/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Economic Matters
SB0504 (HB0478/CH0427) Hagerstown Community College Police Force - Jurisdiction By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2025 - 2:00 PM
SB0580 (HB0749/CH0600) Washington County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0596 /CH0428 (HB0750/CH0236) Property Tax Exemption and Payment in Lieu of Taxes - The Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility, Inc. By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2025 - 2:15 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/28/2025 2:07 PM
Click to return on the top page