Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Abandoned Property

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0305 /CH0648
Title
Financial Institutions - Presumption of Property Abandonment - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0724 (SB0662/CH0040)
Title
Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0060
Title
Financial Institutions – Abandoned Property – Notice and Records
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0271 /CH0361
Title
Commercial Law - Disposition of Abandoned Property - Waiver of Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0347
Title
Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Failure to Pay Rent
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0662 /CH0040 (HB0724)
Title
Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0991
Title
Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Rights of Redemption
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1001
Title
Property Tax – Withholding of Property From Tax Sale – Demolition
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0305 /CH0648 Financial Institutions - Presumption of Property Abandonment - Revisions Delegate Kerr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 648
Economic Matters
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0724 (SB0662/CH0040) Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Funding Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0060 Financial Institutions – Abandoned Property – Notice and Records Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Finance
SB0271 /CH0361 Commercial Law - Disposition of Abandoned Property - Waiver of Penalties Senator Guzzone 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0347 Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Failure to Pay Rent Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0662 /CH0040 (HB0724) Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Funding Senator Zucker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 40
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
SB0991 Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Rights of Redemption Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1001 Property Tax – Withholding of Property From Tax Sale – Demolition Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:16 PM
Click to return on the top page