Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Absentee and Mail-In Ballots

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0099
Title
Election Law – Absentee Ballots – Signature Requirements and Verification
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0212
Title
Election Law - Signature Verification of Absentee Ballots and Absentee Ballot Applications and Ballot Canvassing
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0329
Title
Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0862
Title
Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939
Title
Elections – Absentee Ballots – Mailing of Unrequested Ballots
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0963
Title
Election Law – Absentee Ballots – Signature Verification and Verification Statements and Unsigned Ballot Statements
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172 (SB0989)
Title
Election Law - Absentee Ballot Envelopes - Party Affiliation
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112
Title
Election Law - False Ballot Drop Boxes - Criminal Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0163
Title
Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0352
Title
Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0738
Title
Secure Elections Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0925
Title
Prince George's County - Special Elections Conducted by Mail - Voting Centers
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0989 (HB1172)
Title
Election Law - Absentee Ballot Envelopes - Party Affiliation
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0099 Election Law – Absentee Ballots – Signature Requirements and Verification Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0212 Election Law - Signature Verification of Absentee Ballots and Absentee Ballot Applications and Ballot Canvassing Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0329 Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0862 Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures Delegate Feldmark 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0939 Elections – Absentee Ballots – Mailing of Unrequested Ballots Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0963 Election Law – Absentee Ballots – Signature Verification and Verification Statements and Unsigned Ballot Statements Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1172 (SB0989) Election Law - Absentee Ballot Envelopes - Party Affiliation Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0112 Election Law - False Ballot Drop Boxes - Criminal Penalty Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0163 Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures Senator Kagan 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0352 Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0738 Secure Elections Act of 2022 Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0925 Prince George's County - Special Elections Conducted by Mail - Voting Centers Senator Patterson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 2:45 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2022 - 2:45 PM
SB0989 (HB1172) Election Law - Absentee Ballot Envelopes - Party Affiliation Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 10:54 AM
Click to return on the top page