Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Abuse -see also- Child Abuse & Neg.; Elder Abuse & Neg., etc

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0193 /CH0085 (SB0484/CH0086)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0281 (SB0159)
Title
Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1080 (SB0760)
Title
Criminal Law – Animal Cruelty – Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1122 (SB0776)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Out of Court Statements – Child and Vulnerable Adult Victims
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1281 (SB0844)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0159 (HB0281)
Title
Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0484 /CH0086 (HB0193/CH0085)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0760 (HB1080)
Title
Criminal Law – Animal Cruelty – Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0775
Title
Family Law - Child Custody and Visitation - Abuse
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0776 (HB1122)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Out of Court Statements – Child and Vulnerable Adult Victims
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0844 (HB1281)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0193 /CH0085 (SB0484/CH0086) Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Judiciary
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0281 (SB0159) Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1080 (SB0760) Criminal Law – Animal Cruelty – Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1122 (SB0776) Criminal Procedure – Out of Court Statements – Child and Vulnerable Adult Victims Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1281 (SB0844) Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0159 (HB0281) Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
1/20/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0484 /CH0086 (HB0193/CH0085) Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room Senator Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0760 (HB1080) Criminal Law – Animal Cruelty – Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0775 Family Law - Child Custody and Visitation - Abuse Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0776 (HB1122) Criminal Procedure – Out of Court Statements – Child and Vulnerable Adult Victims Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0844 (HB1281) Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:18 PM
Click to return on the top page