Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Administrative Office of the Courts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0181 (SB0019/CH0347)
Title
Failure to Pay Rent Proceedings - Shielding of Court Records
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0315 /CH0741 (SB0319/CH0742)
Title
Regulated Firearms - Maryland Judiciary - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0405 (SB0365)
Title
Family Law - Child Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Kaufman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496 /CH0761 (SB0758)
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Definition of Consent and Repeal of Force
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 /CH0414 (SB0575/CH0415)
Title
Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0814 /CH0735 (SB0744)
Title
Juvenile Law - Reform
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0978
Title
Courts - Maryland Judicial Public Text Messaging System - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1298
Title
Family Law - Paternity - Surname (Maryland Paternal Naming Rights Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0011 /CH0940
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Vendor Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0019 /CH0347 (HB0181)
Title
Failure to Pay Rent Proceedings - Shielding of Court Records
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0314
Title
Juvenile Law - Willful Misconduct of a Minor - Civil Liability of a Parent, Legal Guardian, or Custodian (Parental Accountability Act)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0319 /CH0742 (HB0315/CH0741)
Title
Regulated Firearms - Maryland Judiciary - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0365 (HB0405)
Title
Family Law - Child Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0575 /CH0415 (HB0664/CH0414)
Title
Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act)
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0744 (HB0814/CH0735)
Title
Juvenile Law - Reform
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 (HB0496/CH0761)
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Definition of Consent and Repeal of Force
Sponsor
Senator Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0827 (HB1079)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Jury Examination and Workgroup to Study the Voir Dire Process
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0858
Title
Revenge Porn - Civil Action and Reporting Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0905 /CH0929 (HB1267)
Title
Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders – Review of Court Records
Sponsor
Senator Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0181 (SB0019/CH0347) Failure to Pay Rent Proceedings - Shielding of Court Records Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
HB0315 /CH0741 (SB0319/CH0742) Regulated Firearms - Maryland Judiciary - Reporting Requirements Delegate Bartlett 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 741
Judiciary
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0405 (SB0365) Family Law - Child Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training Delegate Kaufman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0496 /CH0761 (SB0758) Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Definition of Consent and Repeal of Force Delegate Shetty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 761
Judiciary
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0664 /CH0414 (SB0575/CH0415) Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act) Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Judiciary
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0814 /CH0735 (SB0744) Juvenile Law - Reform Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 735
Judiciary
2/08/2024 - 12:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0978 Courts - Maryland Judicial Public Text Messaging System - Report Delegate Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2024 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1298 Family Law - Paternity - Surname (Maryland Paternal Naming Rights Act) Delegate Young 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
SB0011 /CH0940 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Vendor Contracts Senator Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 940
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0019 /CH0347 (HB0181) Failure to Pay Rent Proceedings - Shielding of Court Records Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0314 Juvenile Law - Willful Misconduct of a Minor - Civil Liability of a Parent, Legal Guardian, or Custodian (Parental Accountability Act) Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0319 /CH0742 (HB0315/CH0741) Regulated Firearms - Maryland Judiciary - Reporting Requirements Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 742
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2024 - 10:30 AM
Judiciary
SB0365 (HB0405) Family Law - Child Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0575 /CH0415 (HB0664/CH0414) Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act) Senator Corderman 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0744 (HB0814/CH0735) Juvenile Law - Reform President 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2024 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0758 (HB0496/CH0761) Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Definition of Consent and Repeal of Force Senator Kelly 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0827 (HB1079) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Jury Examination and Workgroup to Study the Voir Dire Process Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0858 Revenge Porn - Civil Action and Reporting Requirement Senator Hester 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)
Judicial Proceedings
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0905 /CH0929 (HB1267) Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders – Review of Court Records Senator Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 929
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2024 - 2:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:45 PM
Click to return on the top page